Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Pietro Raccamarich

Deceased

Bishop of Ossero (Osor)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1744³BornPago
19 Dec 176723.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 179651.9AppointedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
10 Jul 179652.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
20 Jul 180157.0AppointedBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia
21 Jan 181570.5DiedBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Pietro Raccamarich
Bishop Francesco Pietro Raccamarich (born , died ) Bishop of Ossero (Osor)

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 156
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 98
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1796, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 2 Mar 2016