Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Giuseppe Pistone

Deceased

Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1739Born
3 Jun 176424.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Sep 178849.1AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
21 Sep 178849.2Ordained BishopBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
30 Sep 179556.2DiedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Giuseppe Pistone
Bishop Carlo Giuseppe Pistone (born , died ) Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNizza di Monferrato

  • a priest for 31.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 75
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1788, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast