Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jo„o de Melo

Deceased

Archbishop of …vora, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Mar 1549AppointedBishop of Silves (Sylves), Portugal
21 Jun 1564AppointedArchbishop of …vora, Portugal
6 Aug 1574DiedArchbishop of …vora, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Jo„o de Melo
Archbishop Jo„o de Melo (died ) Archbishop of …vora

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 300, and Page 191
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1549, Number 10*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast