Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop David de Sousa, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Évora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1911BornSão João de Alpendurada
18 Jul 193725.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
23 Sep 195745.9AppointedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
10 Nov 195746.0Ordained BishopBishop of Funchal, Portugal
15 Nov 196554.1AppointedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
17 Oct 198170.0ResignedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
5 Feb 200694.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Évora, Portugal

MicroData Summary for David de Sousa:
Archbishop David de Sousa O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Évora

  • a priest for 68.5 years
  • a bishop for 48.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013