Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domingos de Gusmão, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Évora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1622BornMatriti
8 Nov 167755.9AppointedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
Feb 1678²56.1Ordained BishopBishop of Leiria, Portugal
6 Jun 167856.4AppointedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
19 Nov 168967.9DiedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domingos de Gusmão:
Archbishop Domingos de Gusmão O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Évora

  • a bishop for 11.8 years

Source(s):
  • ob/c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,442
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 192, and Page 241

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013