Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Antonio da Silva Saraiva

Deceased

Bishop of Coimbra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1923BornSeia
28 Jul 194622.9Ordained PriestPriest
30 Aug 196541.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Évora, Portugal
30 Aug 196541.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Mopta
19 Nov 196542.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mopta
21 Nov 196542.2AppointedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
28 Jun 197248.8AppointedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
3 Apr 197652.5DiedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for João Antonio da Silva Saraiva:
Bishop João Antonio da Silva Saraiva (born , died ) Bishop of Coimbra

  • a priest for 29.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013