Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Roderici

Deceased

Bishop of Évora, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1439¹Born
13 Jul 145920.5AppointedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
17 Sep 145920.7AppointedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
27 Sep 145920.7AppointedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
9 Feb 146930.1AppointedBishop of Évora, Portugal
1471¹32.0DiedBishop of Évora, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Roderici
Bishop Juan Roderici (born 1439, died 1471) Bishop of Évora

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 132, and Page 149
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 125
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1459, Number 18*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Aug 2018

Quantcast