Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio José de Oliveira

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Évora, Portugal

Titular Bishop of Eucarpia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1743³Born
18 Oct 177329.9Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 181975.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Évora, Portugal
29 Mar 181975.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
18 Jul 181975.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
29 Jan 182480.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Évora, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio José de Oliveira
Bishop Antonio José de Oliveira (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Évora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Paulo, Brazil
Ordained BishopEspinheiro, Monastery, Évora, Archdiocese of Évora

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,373
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 189
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 42
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,049

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast