Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diogo de Sousa

Deceased

Archbishop of Évora, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Jul 1597AppointedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
1 Mar 1610AppointedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
30 Dec 1610DiedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Diogo de Sousa
Archbishop Diogo de Sousa (died ) Archbishop of Évora

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSao Domingos, Church, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 244, and Page 181
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1597, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast