Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel ab Incarnatione Sobrinho, O.S.P.P.E. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Nemesi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1761³BornMonsaraz, Portugal
2 May 178423.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Paul the First Hermit
21 Mar 182564.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Nemesi
12 Jun 182564.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nemesi
15 Dec 184685.7DiedTitular Bishop of Nemesi

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel ab Incarnatione Sobrinho:
Bishop Emmanuel ab Incarnatione Sobrinho O.S.P.P.E. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Nemesi

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013