Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José António Pereira Bilhano

Deceased

Archbishop of Évora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1801BornIlhavo
25 Apr 182423.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jul 187069.3SelectedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
6 Mar 187170.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
4 Jun 187170.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
18 Sep 189089.5DiedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José António Pereira Bilhano:
Archbishop José António Pereira Bilhano (born , died ) Archbishop of Évora

  • a priest for 66.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,094
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 257

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013