Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Teotónio de Bragança, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Évora, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1530Born
12 Jul 154918.9ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
4 Jul 157847.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Évora, Portugal
4 Jul 157847.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Fesseë
19 Oct 157848.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fesseë
7 Dec 157848.3SucceededArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
29 Jul 160271.9DiedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Teotónio de Bragança (VIAF: 99900343)
Archbishop Teotónio de Bragança S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop of Évora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoimbra

  • a bishop for 23.7 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,629
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1578, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 191, and Page 195

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast