Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José António da Mata e Silva

Deceased

Archbishop of Évora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1800BornCastelo Branco
5 Jun 182524.9Ordained PriestPriest
5 May 185958.8SelectedBishop of Beja, Portugal
20 Jun 185958.9ConfirmedBishop of Beja, Portugal
16 Oct 185959.3Ordained BishopBishop of Beja, Portugal
29 May 186059.9SelectedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
13 Jul 186060.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
5 Sep 186969.2DiedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José António da Mata e Silva:
Archbishop José António da Mata e Silva (born , died ) Archbishop of Évora

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 143, and Page 257
  • ob/c23: CB, 16 Jan 2014
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,060

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015