Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alexandre de Bragança

Deceased

Archbishop of Évora, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1570Born
27 Nov 160232.1AppointedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
20 Apr 160332.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
11 Sep 160837.9DiedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Alexandre de Bragança
Archbishop Alexandre de Bragança (born , died ) Archbishop of Évora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVila Viçosa

  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,100
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 181
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1603, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast