Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Miguel Cardinal da Silva

Deceased

Administrator of Massa Marittima

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1480BornÉvora
21 Nov 152646.9AppointedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
Dec 1529²49.9Ordained BishopBishop of Viseu, Portugal
19 Dec 153960.0Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
2 Dec 154161.9Elevated to Cardinal
6 Feb 154262.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
5 Oct 154363.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
22 Apr 154767.3ResignedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
20 May 154969.4AppointedAdministrator of Massa Marittima, Italy
27 Jun 155272.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
29 Nov 155373.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
11 Dec 155373.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
5 Jun 155676.4DiedAdministrator of Massa Marittima, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel da Silva:
Cardinal Miguel da Silva (died ) Administrator of Massa Marittima

  • a bishop for 26.5 years
  • a cardinal for 16.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1539
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 237
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,816

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013