Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Paes Godinho, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nanking [Nanjing]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1677¹BornEvora, Spain
3 Nov 171740.8SelectedBishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China
11 Feb 171841.1ConfirmedBishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China
21 Sep 171841.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China
11 Feb 172144.1ResignedBishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for António Paes Godinho:
Bishop António Paes Godinho S.J. (born 1677) Bishop Emeritus of Nanking [Nanjing]

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,466
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 63
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 2 Sep 2015