Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingos Barata, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Portalegre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1650¹BornSerra da Estrela
10 May 170050.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Évora, Portugal
10 May 170050.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Missene (Mysia)
29 Aug 170050.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Missene (Mysia)
1 Aug 170757.5AppointedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
25 Apr 170959.3DiedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domingos Barata:
Bishop Domingos Barata O.SS.T. (born 1650, died ) Bishop of Portalegre

  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 278, and Page 321
  • c2+: CB, 20 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1700, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 May 2015