Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joaquim de Santa Clara Brandão (Lopes), O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Évora, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1740Born
31 Mar 175716.5ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
24 May 176625.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
3 Mar 181574.5SelectedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
22 Jul 181675.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
21 Sep 181676.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
11 Jan 181877.3DiedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Joaquim de Santa Clara Brandão (Lopes)
Archbishop Joaquim de Santa Clara Brandão (Lopes) O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Évora

EventPlace
Birth PlacePorto

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 1.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 44
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 184

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast