Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José de Melo

Deceased

Archbishop of Évora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1561¹Born
10 Mar 161049.1AppointedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
18 Jul 161150.5AppointedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
2 Feb 163372.0DiedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José de Melo:
Archbishop José de Melo (died ) Archbishop of Évora

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 244, and Page 181
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1610, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 2 Mar 2015