Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Saverio Cardinal De Luca

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Studies

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1805Born
10 Feb 183933.2Ordained PriestPriest of Monreale, Italy
6 Sep 184539.8SelectedBishop of Aversa, Italy
24 Nov 184540.0ConfirmedBishop of Aversa, Italy
8 Dec 184540.1Ordained BishopBishop of Aversa, Italy
19 Dec 185348.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bavaria
22 Dec 185348.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
16 Jun 185650.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
16 Mar 186357.3Elevated to Cardinal
16 Mar 186357.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
1 Oct 186357.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
28 Dec 186459.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
15 Jul 187872.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
15 Jul 187872.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
13 Aug 187872.7AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies
28 Dec 188378.1DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies

MicroData Summary for Antonio Saverio De Luca (VIAF: 14782334)
Antonio Saverio Cardinal De Luca (born , died ) Prefect of Studies

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBronte
Ordained BishopSS. Trinità a Montecitorio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
  • a cardinal for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 537, and Page 45
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 47, and Page 49
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 100
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1845, Number 50
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 47, and Page 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast