Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ugo Pietro Cardinal Spinola

Deceased

Pro-Datary of the Apostolic Datary

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1791Born
23 Dec 181524.4Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 182635.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
12 Nov 182635.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thebae
14 Nov 182635.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
30 Sep 183140.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
2 Jul 183241.0Elevated to Cardinal
2 Jul 183241.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
17 Dec 183241.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
29 Apr 184452.8AppointedPro-Datary of the Apostolic Datary
21 Jan 185866.5DiedPro-Datary of the Apostolic Datary

MicroData Summary for Ugo Pietro Spinola (VIAF: 89063534)
Ugo Pietro Cardinal Spinola (born , died ) Pro-Datary of Apostolic Datary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenoa, Archdiocese of Genova, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.1 years
  • a cardinal for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 365
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 41
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Sep 1831
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast