Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Michele Cardinal Viale-Prelà

Deceased

Archbishop of Bologna, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Andrea e Gregorio al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1798Born
29 Sep 182325.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Aug 183839.8AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Bavaria
12 Jul 184142.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
12 Jul 184142.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bavaria
18 Jul 184142.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
27 May 184546.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
15 Mar 185253.4Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
185354.2AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Austria
7 Mar 185354.4Elevated to Cardinal
28 Sep 185556.9AppointedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
18 Sep 185657.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Andrea e Gregorio al Monte Celio
15 May 186061.6DiedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Viale-Prelà (VIAF: 89733082)
Michele Cardinal Viale-Prelà (born , died ) Archbishop of Bologna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBastia
Ordained BishopSan Carlo ai Catinari, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceBologna, Archdiocese of Bologna

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
  • a cardinal for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 152, and Page 46
  • ob/c2+: CB, 8 Apr 2012
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 136
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1841, Number 23
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 47, and Page 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast