Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Caetani (Jr.)

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1566¹BornRoma
31 Aug 160539.6AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
11 Sep 160539.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Capua, Italy
3 May 160741.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
12 Nov 161044.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
27 Oct 161145.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
17 Jul 161852.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
19 Apr 162155.2Elevated to Cardinal
17 May 162155.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
17 Mar 162458.2DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Caetani (Jr.) (VIAF: 52867541)
Antonio Cardinal Caetani (Jr.) (born 1566, died ) Archbishop of Capua

  • a bishop for 18.5 years
  • a cardinal for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Apr 1621
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 16, and Page 133
  • ob/c2: CB, 21 Jun 2011
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1605, Number 18
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 257

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 3 Oct 2016