Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Enrico Cardinal Sibilia

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1861Born
8 Mar 188422.3Ordained PriestPriest of Anagni, Italy
29 Jul 190846.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Chile
1 Aug 190846.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Side
11 Oct 190846.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Side
24 Nov 190847.0AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Chile
Apr 1914²52.3ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Chile
16 Dec 192261.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
16 Dec 193574.0Elevated to Cardinal
18 Jun 193674.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova
11 Dec 193978.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto
4 Aug 194886.7DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Enrico Sibilia (VIAF: 172015189)
Enrico Cardinal Sibilia (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnagni, Diocese of Anagni, Italy
Death PlaceAnagni, Diocese of Anagni, Italy

  • a priest for 64.4 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
  • a cardinal for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,908, Number 61
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 50, and Page 88, and Page 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast