Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesare Speciano (Speciani)

Deceased

Bishop of Cremona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1539Born
1567¹27.3Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
28 Nov 158445.2AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
13 Dec 158445.2Ordained BishopBishop of Novara, Italy
11 Dec 158546.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
27 Aug 158848.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
30 Jan 159151.4AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
14 May 159252.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
20 Jun 159757.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
21 Aug 160767.9DiedBishop of Cremona, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cesare Speciano (Speciani) (VIAF: 124767)
Bishop Cesare Speciano (Speciani) (born , died ) Bishop of Cremona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCremona, Diocese of Cremona
Ordained PriestMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceSpoleto, Diocese of Spoleto

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 261
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 22, Number 95
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 287
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1584, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018