Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Raffaele Cardinal Scapinelli di Leguigno

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation of the Affairs of Religious

Cardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati

Datary of the Apostolic Datary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1858Born
1884²25.6Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 190849.8AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
27 Jan 191253.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
30 Jan 191253.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Syria
25 Feb 191253.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Syria
6 Dec 191557.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
6 Dec 191557.6Elevated to Cardinal
6 Dec 191557.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
19 Dec 191860.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Affairs of Religious
6 Mar 192061.8ResignedPrefect of the Congregation of the Affairs of Religious
22 Jul 193072.2AppointedDatary of the Apostolic Datary
16 Sep 193375.3DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation of the Affairs of Religious

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Scapinelli di Leguigno
Raffaele Cardinal Scapinelli di Leguigno (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Affairs of Religious

EventPlace
Birth PlaceModena, Italy
Death PlaceForte dei Marmi

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
  • a cardinal for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 12
  • x933/nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 24, and Page 25, and Page 49
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast