Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Placido della Marra

Deceased

Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1560²Born
6 Mar 159535.1AppointedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
2 Apr 159535.2Ordained BishopBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
21 Jul 161252.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
25 Aug 161656.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
2 Dec 162060.9DiedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Placido della Marra
Bishop Placido della Marra (born 1560, died ) Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopS. Barthelemy, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceMelfi, Diocese of Melfi e Rapolla

  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/ab/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 238
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 34, Number 169
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 241
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 272
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1595, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast