Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Galimberti

Deceased

Archivist of the Vatican Secret Archives

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1836BornRoma, Italy
18 Dec 185822.6Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
23 May 188751.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
23 May 188751.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
5 Jun 188751.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
16 Jan 189356.7Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jun 189357.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
25 Jun 189458.1AppointedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archives
7 May 189660.0DiedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archives

MicroData Summary for Luigi Galimberti:
Luigi Cardinal Galimberti (born , died ) Archivist of Vatican Secret Archives

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
  • a cardinal for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 411, and Page 51
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Jan 1893

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014