Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ciriaco Cardinal Rocci

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Salvatore in Lauro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1582Born
29 May 162845.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
14 Jun 162845.8Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jun 162845.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
2 Jul 162845.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
19 Nov 162947.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
18 May 163047.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
28 Nov 163351.3Elevated to Cardinal
8 Jul 163451.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
13 Aug 163553.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Salvatore in Lauro
30 Sep 163553.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Salvatore in Lauro
25 Sep 165169.1DiedCardinal-Priest of San Salvatore in Lauro

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Ciriaco Rocci (VIAF: 89113516)
Ciriaco Cardinal Rocci (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Salvatore in Lauro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained PriestFerrara, Diocese of Ferrara, Italy
Ordained BishopGesů, Church, Ferrara, Diocese of Ferrara, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Family's Chapel, Santa Maria di Monserrato, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 23.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
  • a cardinal for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Nov 1629
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 23
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1628, Number 29
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 282
  • b/c2: AT, 29 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017