Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alfonso Cardinal Visconti, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Spoleto

Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1552¹BornMilan
1575¹23.0Ordained PriestPriest
157725.0ProfessedPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
8 Feb 159139.1AppointedBishop of Cervia, Italy
3 Mar 159947.2Elevated to Cardinal
7 Mar 159947.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
24 Jan 160048.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
10 Sep 160149.7AppointedBishop of Spoleto, Italy
19 Sep 160856.7DiedBishop of Spoleto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Visconti:
Cardinal Alfonso Visconti C.O. (died ) Bishop of Spoleto

  • a priest for 33.7 years
  • a cardinal for 9.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 Mar 1599
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 321
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 164

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013