Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Filippo Cardinal Sega

Deceased

Bishop of Piacenza, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1537Born
20 May 157537.7AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
29 Jun 157537.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
8 Jul 157739.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
3 Oct 157841.1AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
30 Apr 158143.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
18 Jan 158648.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
28 May 158749.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
18 Dec 159154.3Elevated to Cardinal
5 Dec 159457.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
29 May 159658.7DiedBishop of Piacenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Sega (VIAF: 62360362)
Filippo Cardinal Sega (born , died ) Bishop of Piacenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Diocese of Bologna
Ordained BishopCathedral, Osimo, Diocese of Osimo
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 20.9 years
  • a cardinal for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1591
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 275, and Page 285
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 286
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1575, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 5 Dec 2017