Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Sebastiano Antonio Cardinal Tanara

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Abbot of Nonantola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1650BornRoma, Italy
29 Jun 167525.2AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Belgium
28 Apr 168737.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Damascus
10 May 168737.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
13 Jul 168737.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Damascus
18 Jul 168737.2ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Belgium
3 Jun 169040.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
19 Aug 169040.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
23 Jan 169241.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
11 Mar 169241.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
12 Dec 169545.6Elevated to Cardinal
1696¹45.7AppointedAbbot of Nonantola, Italy
9 Feb 169645.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
21 May 169646.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
1 Apr 171564.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
3 Mar 172170.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
5 May 172474.0DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Antonio Tanara (VIAF: 77186824)
Sebastiano Antonio Cardinal Tanara (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a bishop for 36.8 years
  • a cardinal for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1695
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,525
  • ob: CB, 21 Jun 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1687, Number 6
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 263

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016