Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gennaro Cardinal Granito Pignatelli di Belmonte

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of Ceremonies

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia

Bishop of Albano

Dean of the College of Cardinals


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1851Born
7 Jun 187928.1Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
17 Nov 189948.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
26 Nov 189948.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
5 Dec 189948.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
15 Jan 190452.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
6 Jan 191159.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
27 Nov 191160.6Elevated to Cardinal
30 Nov 191160.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
6 Dec 191564.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
6 Dec 191564.6AppointedBishop of Albano, Italy
9 Jul 193079.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia
9 Jul 193079.2ConfirmedDean of the College of Cardinals
14 Jul 193079.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Ceremonies
16 Feb 194896.8DiedPrefect of the Congregation of Ceremonies

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Granito Pignatelli di Belmonte (VIAF: 9840153)
Gennaro Cardinal Granito Pignatelli di Belmonte (born , died ) Prefect of Ceremonies

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Ordained PriestNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Ordained BishopSisters of S. Anna, in via Merulana, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceSanta Marta, Vatican, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Capuchin friars tomb, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 68.6 years
  • a bishop for 48.2 years
  • a cardinal for 36.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 256
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 43
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1899, Number 61
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017