Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giulio Cardinal Piazza

Deceased

Archbishop (Personal Title) of Faenza, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1663Born
Dec 1690³27.7AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Belgium
May 1696³33.1ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Belgium
2 Dec 169734.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
22 Dec 169734.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
25 Jan 169834.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
7 Jan 170339.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
4 Jun 170340.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
31 Jul 170643.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
Aug 1706³43.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
13 Sep 170643.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
Dec 1707³44.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
24 Dec 170946.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
21 Jul 171047.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Faenza, Italy
18 May 171249.1Elevated to Cardinal
Sep 1713³50.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
16 Apr 171451.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
23 Apr 172663.1DiedBishop of Faenza, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Piazza (VIAF: 16944056)
Giulio Cardinal Piazza (born , died ) Archbishop (Personal Title) of Faenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForli
Ordained BishopSant' Andrea della Valle, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Faenza, Diocese of Faenza

  • a bishop for 28.3 years
  • a cardinal for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 May 1712
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 37
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 256

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast