Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gaspare Cardinal Mattei

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1598²BornRoma, Italy
8 Aug 163941.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
5 Sep 163941.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenae
30 Oct 163941.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Athenae
13 Jul 164345.5Elevated to Cardinal
14 Dec 164345.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
2 Apr 164446.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
28 Sep 164850.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
9 Apr 165052.2DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspare Mattei (VIAF: 198679439)
Gaspare Cardinal Mattei (born 1598, died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia

  • a bishop for 10.4 years
  • a cardinal for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Jul 1643
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 25, and Page 99
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,006
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1639, Number 30
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 273

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016