Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Buonvisi

Deceased

Bishop of Lucca

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1626BornLucca
16 Jun 167044.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
6 Jul 167044.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
16 Jul 167044.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
3 Nov 167246.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
20 Jul 167549.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
1 Sep 168155.2Elevated to Cardinal
1689²62.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
14 Nov 168963.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
27 Sep 169064.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Lucca, Italy
25 Aug 170074.2DiedBishop of Lucca, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Buonvisi:
Francesco Cardinal Buonvisi (born , died ) Bishop of Lucca

  • a bishop for 30.1 years
  • a cardinal for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Sep 1681
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1670, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015