Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Leardi

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Austria

Titular Archbishop of Ephesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1762¹Born
18 Jul 178422.5Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 181654.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
23 Sep 181654.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
12 Jan 181755.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
31 Dec 182361.9DiedApostolic Nuncio to Austria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Leardi (VIAF: 76656824)
Archbishop Paolo Leardi (born 1762, died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Austria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasale Monferrato, Italy

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1817, Number 2
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 188
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 45, and Page 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast