Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Orazio Malaspina

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Albenga, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Sep 1578AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
15 Jun 1581ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
8 Jan 1582AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
Feb 1582²DiedBishop-Elect of Albenga, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Orazio Malaspina (VIAF: 295249057)
Father Orazio Malaspina (died Feb 1582) Bishop-Elect of Albenga

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 102
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 272
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1582

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast