Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Camillo Caetani

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1552¹Born
22 Aug 158836.6AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
28 Aug 158836.6Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
22 Apr 159139.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
14 May 159240.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
1 Sep 159240.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
24 Mar 160048.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
5 Aug 1602³50.5DiedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Camillo Caetani (VIAF: 305334178)
Patriarch Camillo Caetani (born 1552, died ) Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceItaly
Ordained BishopS.Marie du Peuple, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 76
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 102
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 28, Number 132
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 257
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1588, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast