Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Francesco Bonomigni (Bonomi, Bonhomini)

Deceased

Bishop of Vercelli, Italy

Apostolic Nuncio to Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1536Born
17 Oct 157235.8AppointedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
1 Feb 157336.1Ordained BishopBishop of Vercelli, Italy
27 May 157942.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
16 Sep 158144.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
20 Oct 158447.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
26 Feb 158750.2DiedBishop of Vercelli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Bonomigni (Bonomi, Bonhomini) (VIAF: 20474237)
Bishop Giovanni Francesco Bonomigni (Bonomi, Bonhomini) (born , died ) Bishop of Vercelli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCremona, Diocese of Cremona
Ordained BishopMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Death PlaceLiège, Diocese of Liège, Belgium

  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 330
  • ob/c2: CB, 16 Sep 2011
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 255
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1573, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast