Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mario Cardinal Alberizzi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1609BornSalve
19 Jan 167161.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto
25 Jan 167161.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto
27 May 167565.4Elevated to Cardinal
27 May 167565.4ResignedTitular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto
23 Mar 167666.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
22 Jun 167666.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Tivoli, Italy
4 Sep 167969.7ResignedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
29 Sep 168070.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Tivoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario Alberizzi:
Cardinal Mario Alberizzi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
  • a cardinal for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 May 1675

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013