Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Agostino Gervasio, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1730BornMontorio
23 Dec 175222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
13 Jan 177039.9SelectedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
29 Jan 177040.0ConfirmedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
4 Feb 177040.0Ordained BishopBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
17 Nov 178454.8ResignedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
16 Dec 179161.9SelectedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
27 Feb 179262.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
17 Mar 1806³76.1DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agostino Gervasio:
Archbishop Agostino Gervasio O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Capua

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 36.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 147, and Page 223
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 7 Jan 2016