Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Olivazzi

Deceased

Bishop of Pavia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1704BornMilano
11 Sep 176965.0AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
21 Dec 176965.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Dec 176965.3Ordained PriestPriest
31 Dec 176965.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pavia, Italy
14 Sep 179187.0DiedBishop of Pavia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Olivazzi:
Bishop Bartolomeo Olivazzi (born , died ) Bishop of Pavia

  • a priest for 21.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 328
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1769, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015