Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angiolo (Angelo) Cesarini

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Milevum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1743BornPerugia
21 Dec 176522.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 May 176623.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 180158.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Milevum
29 Sep 180158.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Milevum
7 May 181067.3DiedTitular Bishop of Milevum

MicroData Summary for Angiolo (Angelo) Cesarini:
Bishop Angiolo (Angelo) Cesarini (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Milevum

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 264

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013