Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Tafuri

Deceased

Bishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1712BornLecce
9 Mar 174330.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
13 Apr 174330.5Ordained PriestPriest
5 Aug 176552.8AppointedBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy
18 Aug 176552.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy
1 Jun 177865.6AppointedBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy
6 Oct 179684.0DiedBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Tafuri:
Bishop Michele Tafuri (born , died ) Bishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni)

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 158, and Page 353
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 143
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1765, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015