Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Andrea Cardinal Corsini

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1735BornFlorence, Italy
24 Sep 175924.2Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 175924.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
2 Feb 176933.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 176934.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana
15 Jul 177641.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
21 Jul 177641.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sabina
18 Jan 179559.6DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

MicroData Summary for Andrea Corsini:
Andrea Cardinal Corsini (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a priest for 25.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
  • a cardinal for 35.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Sep 1759

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015