Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Cioja

Deceased

Bishop of Todi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1740¹BornRoma
22 Dec 180060.9AppointedBishop of Todi, Italy
27 Dec 180060.9Ordained BishopBishop of Todi, Italy
17 Jun 180565.4DiedBishop of Todi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Cioja:
Bishop Francesco Maria Cioja (died ) Bishop of Todi

  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1800, Number 23
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 380

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015