Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Coppola

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Myra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1752BornNapoli, Italy
15 Apr 177522.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Oct 180048.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Myra
28 Oct 180048.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Myra
15 Dec 180755.4DiedTitular Archbishop of Myra

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Coppola:
Archbishop Giovanni Coppola (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Myra

  • a priest for 32.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1800, Number 15
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 274

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015