Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Rovegno

Deceased

Archbishop of Brindisi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1702BornPallagori
20 Dec 173230.6Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 175956.9SelectedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
28 May 175957.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
4 Jun 175957.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
25 Oct 176361.5DiedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Rovegno:
Archbishop Domenico Rovegno (born , died ) Archbishop of Brindisi

  • a priest for 30.8 years
  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 132
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015