Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paolo Francesco Cardinal Antamori

Deceased

Bishop of Orvieto

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Alessio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1712BornRome
1 Jun 177663.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Roma {Rome}, Italy
11 Dec 178068.0AppointedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
11 Dec 178068.0Elevated to Cardinal
11 Feb 178168.2Ordained BishopBishop of Orvieto, Italy
2 Apr 178168.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Alessio
4 Dec 179583.0DiedBishop of Orvieto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Francesco Antamori
Paolo Francesco Cardinal Antamori (born , died ) Bishop of Orvieto

  • a bishop for 14.8 years
  • a cardinal for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Dec 1780
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1781, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016